This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/22/2022 at 11:03:55 (UTC).

HOPE CHADWICK VS THE KROGER CO., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/08/2022 HOPE CHADWICK filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE KROGER CO ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9246

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHADWICK HOPE

Defendants

RALPHS

THE KROGER CO.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EISENBERG GARY CARL

Defendant Attorney

STONE GREGORY EDWARD

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/8/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/8/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

9/8/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

9/8/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/8/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/8/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/8/2022: Complaint

Answer

10/6/2022: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2024
  • Hearing09/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2024
  • Hearing03/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2024
  • Hearing02/22/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Hughes Markets, Inc. dba Ralphs Erroneously Sued As Ralphs (Defendant); As to: Hope Chadwick (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Hope Chadwick (Plaintiff); As to: The Kroger Co. (Defendant); Ralphs (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 09/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Hope Chadwick (Plaintiff); As to: The Kroger Co. (Defendant); Ralphs (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Hope Chadwick (Plaintiff); As to: The Kroger Co. (Defendant); Ralphs (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 02/22/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael E. Whitaker in Department 32 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RALPHS is a litigant

Latest cases where The Kroger Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STONE GREGORY EDWARD