This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/30/2021 at 07:39:31 (UTC).

HOOMAN NAFISSI VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A POLITICAL SUBDIVISION OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/11/2019 HOOMAN NAFISSI filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A POLITICAL SUBDIVISION OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1207

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NAFISSI HOOMAN

Defendants and Respondents

CHARLES BECK IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS CHIEF OF POLICE

MICHEL MOORE IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS CHIEF OF POLICE

CITY OF LOS ANGELES A POLITICAL SUBDIVISION OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

HAMMOND LESLIE LEE

WILCOX LESLIE LEE

Respondent Attorney

AGUILERA DANIEL PHILLIP

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/12/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition for Writ of Mandate

4/11/2019: Petition for Writ of Mandate

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/11/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

4/15/2019: Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

7/25/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/12/2020

5/12/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/12/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/12/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE)

10/1/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE)

Reply - REPLY PETITIONERS REPLY TO RESPONDENTS OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDATE

9/17/2020: Reply - REPLY PETITIONERS REPLY TO RESPONDENTS OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDATE

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING PETITIONERS NOTICE OF LODGING OF THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD AND JOINT APPENDIX

9/17/2020: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING PETITIONERS NOTICE OF LODGING OF THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD AND JOINT APPENDIX

Opposition - OPPOSITION [RESPONDENTS'] TO PETITION FOR PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDAMUS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF LANCE G. PORTER IN SUPPORT THEREOF

8/31/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION [RESPONDENTS'] TO PETITION FOR PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDAMUS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF LANCE G. PORTER IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Amended Complaint - AMENDED PETITION (1ST)

8/6/2020: Amended Complaint - AMENDED PETITION (1ST)

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES PETITIONER'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDATE

8/4/2020: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES PETITIONER'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDATE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/NOTICE OF ENTRY OF...)

12/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/NOTICE OF ENTRY OF...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/NOTICE OF ENTRY OF...) OF 12/09/2020

12/9/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/NOTICE OF ENTRY OF...) OF 12/09/2020

Judgment - JUDGMENT PROPOSED JUDGMENT

11/18/2020: Judgment - JUDGMENT PROPOSED JUDGMENT

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 82; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (COURT ORDER CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/NOTICE OF ENTRY OF...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((COURT ORDER CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/NOTICE OF ENTRY OF...) of 12/09/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketWrit of Mandate; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Hooman Nafissi (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 82; Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Lodging (Petitioners Notice Of Lodging Of The Administrative Record And Joint Appendix); Filed by Hooman Nafissi (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketReply (Petitioners Reply To Respondents Opposition To Petition For Peremptory Writ Of Mandate); Filed by Hooman Nafissi (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketOpposition ([RESPONDENTS'] TO PETITION FOR PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDAMUS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF LANCE G. PORTER IN SUPPORT THEREOF); Filed by CITY OF LOS ANGELES (Respondent); CHARLES BECK, in his official capacity as Chief of Police (Respondent); MICHEL MOORE, in his official capacity as Chief of Police (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 82; Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • Docketat 3:40 PM in Department 82; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (COURT ORDER)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((COURT ORDER) of 05/12/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 82; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Hooman Nafissi (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate; Filed by Hooman Nafissi (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILCOX LESLIE LEE