This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2023 at 02:42:44 (UTC).

HONHAI, INC. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/14/2022 HONHAI, INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2767

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HONHAI INC.

Defendant

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NOEL LEILA

Defendant Attorneys

FLIGOR CRAIG

HUESTON JOHN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/17/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/6/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE (CROSS-COMPLAINANTS AND CROSS-DEFEN...)

2/2/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE (CROSS-COMPLAINANTS AND CROSS-DEFEN...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

2/1/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

1/9/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION ...)

12/9/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION ...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) [BC6...)

11/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) [BC6...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/25/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Order - ORDER RE: PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASE

8/25/2022: Order - ORDER RE: PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASE

Unknown - DECLARATION OF CRAIG A. FLIGOR IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANYS PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

8/11/2022: Unknown - DECLARATION OF CRAIG A. FLIGOR IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANYS PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP) - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANYS PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

8/11/2022: Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP) - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANYS PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANYS PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASE

8/11/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANYS PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASE

Unknown - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASE

8/12/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 07/21/2022

7/21/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 07/21/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

7/21/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

Complaint

7/14/2022: Complaint

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

7/14/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/14/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2023
  • Hearing06/23/2023 at 1:30 PM in Department 10 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Further Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Appearance Case Review scheduled for 12/30/2033 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 10 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/27/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference (Cross-Complainants and Cross-Defen...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Further Status Conference scheduled for 02/01/2023 at 02:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 10 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 02/02/2023 02:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion ...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) [BC6...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Honhai, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketCase assigned in Department 11 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Honhai, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Addendum and Statement of Location; Filed by: Honhai, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Honhai, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less