This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/26/2020 at 07:27:53 (UTC).

HONGWEI LIU ET AL VS FENG CONSTRUCTION CORP ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/22/2018 HONGWEI LIU filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against FENG CONSTRUCTION CORP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8821

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

HUANG ZHOMING

LIU HONGWEI

YU ZHIHAI

WANG YING

HOU YUNGHUANG

ZHOU WENQI

XIE YOUSHANG

LIU SHUAND

WANG WEI

LIU SHUANG

HUANG ZHOUMING

HOU YUNHUANG AN INDIVIDUAL

WANG YING AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendants and Respondents

ROCKWELL REALTY MANAGEMENT INC.

PANG BEN

PANG KENNY

FENG CONSTRUCTION CORP.

DOES 1-50

YUAN FENGLIN

Not Classified By Court

ZIONS BANCORPORATION N.A. DBA CALIFORNIA BANK & TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

JACOBS JEFFREY G.

JACOBS JEFFREY GEORGE

Attorney at Law Office of Jeffrey G. Jacobs

15615 Alton Parkway Suite 270

Irvine, CA 92618

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BUNT RICHARD A. ESQ.

Attorney at The Law Office of Richard A. Bunt

P.O. Box 91928

City Of Industry,, CA 91715-0000

BUNT RICHARD ALAN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

10/20/2020: Notice of Ruling

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

7/13/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/24/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $250 FOR P...)

12/17/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $250 FOR P...)

Notice of Ruling

11/25/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

11/13/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF ...)

4/23/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF ...)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: failure t...)

1/22/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: failure t...)

PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA TO CALIFORNIA BANK & TRUST AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST CALIFORNIA BANK & TRUST IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,085.00

9/25/2018: PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA TO CALIFORNIA BANK & TRUST AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST CALIFORNIA BANK & TRUST IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,085.00

Declaration - Declaration of Robert Addison, Jr. in Support of Opposition of Non-Party Zions Bancorporation N.A.

11/6/2018: Declaration - Declaration of Robert Addison, Jr. in Support of Opposition of Non-Party Zions Bancorporation N.A.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

8/1/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Legacy Event Type : Motion to Compel) of 11/19/2018

11/19/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Legacy Event Type : Motion to Compel) of 11/19/2018

Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: entry of ...)

12/18/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: entry of ...)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

11/16/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Legacy Event Type : Motion to Compel)

11/19/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Legacy Event Type : Motion to Compel)

Declaration - Declaration of Kevin Mwangi in Support of Opposition of Third Party

11/6/2018: Declaration - Declaration of Kevin Mwangi in Support of Opposition of Third Party

Declaration - Declaration Of Jeffrey G. Jacobs

11/9/2018: Declaration - Declaration Of Jeffrey G. Jacobs

Separate Statement

11/9/2018: Separate Statement

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2021
  • Hearing04/19/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • Hearing04/09/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • Hearing03/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • Hearing03/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Feng Construction Corp. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion; Filed by Feng Construction Corp. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion; Filed by Feng Construction Corp. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketMotion to Compel (Responses to Form Interrogatories, Special Interrogatories, Request for Production of Documents and Imposing Monetary Sanctions); Filed by Feng Construction Corp. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
92 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-06-12 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketANSWER OF FENG CONSTRUCTION CORP. AND FENGLIN YUAN TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Feng Construction Corp. (Defendant); Fenglin Yuan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR MONEY DAMAGES: 1. AIDING AND ABETTING FRAUD; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Yunhuang Hou (Plaintiff); Zhuoming Huang (Plaintiff); Hongwei Liu (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC698821    Hearing Date: October 15, 2020    Dept: 74

BC698821 HONGWEI LIU vs FENG CONSTRUCTION CORP

Defendants’ Unopposed Motion To Compel Responses To Form Interrogatories, Special Interrogatories, And Request For Production Of Documents, And For Monetary Sanctions

TENTATIVE RULING: Plaintiffs are ordered to provide verified, code compliant responses to Defendants’ Form Interrogatories, set one within 30 days. Defendants’ request for orders compelling responses to their special interrogatories, and request for production of documents are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to filing separate motions. Defendants’ request for sanction is DENIED.

Case Number: BC698821    Hearing Date: February 27, 2020    Dept: 74

BC698821 HONGWEI LIU VS FENG CONSTRUCTION CORP

Plaintiff’s Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Production

TENTATIVE RULING: The motion is granted. Defendant Feng Construction Corp. is ordered to produce all documents within 15 days. Defendant Feng Construction Corp. is ordered to pay plaintiff Hongwei Liu sanctions of $1710 within 30 days.

This is a motion to compel compliance, as defendant responded with an agreement to produce documents but failed to produce any documents.

A motion to compel compliance as agreed with a request for production of documents is based upon a showing that the respondents failed to failed to permit an inspection ‘in accordance with that party's statement of compliance.’" (Standon Co. v. Sup. Ct. (1990) 225 Cal. App. 3d 898, 903; Code Civ. Proc., § 2031.320, subd. (a).)

The motion is granted. Defendant Feng Construction Corp. is ordered to produce all documents within 15 days.

Sanctions

Plaintiff seeks sanctions of $1710. The request is granted.