This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/10/2022 at 12:31:45 (UTC).

HONGLI RONG VS YIMO LEI

Case Summary

On 07/29/2022 HONGLI RONG filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against YIMO LEI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CURTIS A. KIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4514

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RONG HONGLI

Defendant

LEI YIMO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HSU ROGER C.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

7/29/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

7/29/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/29/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/29/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/29/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/29/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

7/29/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/18/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

8/18/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AS T...)

9/28/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AS T...)

Proof of Service by Mail

9/27/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Personal Service

9/27/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; ORDER

11/2/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; ORDER

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2022
  • Hearing12/16/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; ORDER: Status Date changed from 11/02/2022 to 11/02/2022; Name Extension changed from STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; [PROPOSED] ORDER to STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; ORDER; Result Date changed from 11/02/2022 to 11/02/2022; As To Parties changed from Hongli Rong (Plaintiff) to Hongli Rong (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; [PROPOSED] ORDER; Signed and Filed by: Yimo Lei (Defendant); As to: Hongli Rong (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; [PROPOSED] ORDER: Filed By: Yimo Lei (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 11/02/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service as t...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service as to defendant Yimo Lei scheduled for 09/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 72 updated: Result Date to 09/28/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Hongli Rong (Plaintiff); As to: Yimo Lei (Defendant); Service Date: 09/18/2022; Service Cost: 125.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Hongli Rong (Plaintiff); As to: Yimo Lei (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service as to defendant Yimo Lei scheduled for 09/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 72

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/16/2022 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 72

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Hongli Rong (Plaintiff); As to: Yimo Lei (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Hongli Rong (Plaintiff); As to: Yimo Lei (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Hongli Rong (Plaintiff); As to: Yimo Lei (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Curtis A. Kin in Department 72 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HSU ROGER C.