This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/10/2022 at 14:51:48 (UTC).

HONGHAI LU, ET AL. VS HONG KONG SUPERMARKET

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 HONGHAI LU filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HONG KONG SUPERMARKET. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0142

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LU HONGHAI

LYU MING

Defendant

HONG KONG SUPERMARKET

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GHERMEZIAN RAYMOND

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/2/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/2/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/2/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/2/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Other - - Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates

1/25/2019: Other - - Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates

1/25/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

5/8/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: JUNE 17, 2020)

4/24/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: JUNE 17, 2020)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: JUNE 17, 2020) OF 04/24/2020

4/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: JUNE 17, 2020) OF 04/24/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO SERVE / ALTE...) OF 01/07/2021

1/7/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO SERVE / ALTE...) OF 01/07/2021

Order - Dismissal

1/7/2021: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO SERVE / ALTE...)

1/7/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO SERVE / ALTE...)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (dismissal for failure to serve / alternatively Trial Setting Conference) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: dismissal for failure to serve / alte...) of 01/07/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: dismissal for failure to serve / alte...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Continuance); Filed by Honghai Lu (Plaintiff); MIng Lyu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • Docketat 10:08 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: June 17, 2020)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: June 17, 2020) of 04/24/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketStanding Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Honghai Lu (Plaintiff); MIng Lyu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Honghai Lu (Plaintiff); MIng Lyu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Honghai Lu (Plaintiff); MIng Lyu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HONG KONG SUPERMARKET is a litigant