This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/07/2022 at 03:16:48 (UTC).

HONGFEI QU ET AL VS HENRY GLOBAL CONSULTING ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/30/2017 HONGFEI QU filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HENRY GLOBAL CONSULTING. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA M. SCHEPER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5035

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

LAI HONGYAN

QU HONGFEI

ZHENG XIONGXIAN

LIU JING

LI YUAN

ZHEN DANXIA

LU SHAO MEI

DAI HONGHUI

Respondents and Defendants

AMERICAN DREAM FUND LLC

HENRY GLOBAL CONSULTING

LAS VEGAS REGIONAL CENTER

LAS VEGAS RESORT INVESTMENT COMPANY LLC

GOLDSTONE ADVISORS LIMITED

SBEHG LAS VEGAS I LLC

SLS TRANCHE 1 LENDER LLC

SBE VOTECO COMPANY LLC

86 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BELL JEFFREY THOMAS ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

SPIEGEL JOHN W.

CICILIANO DYLAN T.

AKLEY BENJAMIN S.

CHA JOHN SUNG ESQ.

CHARRON WILLIAM L.

COOPERMAN LAUREN B.

SOLOWAY TODD E

TAITELMAN MICHAEL ANDREW

TAPANES MARIO ANTONIO

YBARRA JOSEPH JOHN

Respondent Attorney

GREENBAUM MARTIN BEIN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (RE PLAINTIFFS & DEFENDANT HENRY T...)

7/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (RE PLAINTIFFS & DEFENDANT HENRY T...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: PAYMENT OF ANNUAL PRO HAC VICE...)

8/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: PAYMENT OF ANNUAL PRO HAC VICE...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: PAYMENT OF ANNUAL PRO HAC VICE...) OF 08/04/2021

8/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: PAYMENT OF ANNUAL PRO HAC VICE...) OF 08/04/2021

Notice of Hearing on Petition - NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD AND ENTER JUDGMENT

8/5/2021: Notice of Hearing on Petition - NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD AND ENTER JUDGMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JEFFREY T. BELL

8/9/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JEFFREY T. BELL

Motion to Vacate - MOTION TO VACATE THE JAMS ARBITRATION AWARD

8/9/2021: Motion to Vacate - MOTION TO VACATE THE JAMS ARBITRATION AWARD

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/9/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Substitution of Attorney

8/10/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO VACATE FINAL ARBITRATION AWARD

8/18/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO VACATE FINAL ARBITRATION AWARD

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

8/18/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOSEPH J. YBARRA IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO VACATE FINAL ARBITRATION AWARD

8/18/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOSEPH J. YBARRA IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO VACATE FINAL ARBITRATION AWARD

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS' REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD AND ENTER JUDGMENT

8/24/2021: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS' REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD AND ENTER JUDGMENT

Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO VACATE

8/24/2021: Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO VACATE

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JOSEPH J. YBARRA IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' REPLY BRIEF RE. PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD AND ENTER JUDGMENT

8/24/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JOSEPH J. YBARRA IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' REPLY BRIEF RE. PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD AND ENTER JUDGMENT

Response - RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

8/26/2021: Response - RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

Notice of Ruling

8/31/2021: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD; CASE MANAGEMEN...)

8/31/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD; CASE MANAGEMEN...)

Request - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD

9/16/2021: Request - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD

206 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2022
  • Hearing10/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • Hearing09/21/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department STL-D at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; MSC Timeslot

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • Docketat 10:46 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Setting of Mandatory Settlement Conference;)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Henry Tongzhao USA Consulting Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30; Non-Appearance Case Review (Re Status of 09/06/2022 Trial Date (dark)) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Non-Appearance Case Review Re Status...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Ran Ni (Plaintiff); Hanzheng Wang (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
336 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Hongfei Qu (Plaintiff); Hongyan Lai (Plaintiff); Xiongxian Zheng (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. FRAUD ;ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****5035    Hearing Date: June 29, 2020    Dept: 30

Dept. 30

Calendar No.

Hongfei Qu, et. al. vs. Henry Global Consulting, et. al., Case No. ****5035

Tentative Ruling re: Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

Defendants/Petitioners Stockbridge Capital Group, LLC, Las Vegas Resort Investment Company, LLC, and SBE Voteco Company, LLC petition the Court to confirm the arbitration award and enter judgment for Defendants/ Petitioners, dismissing all claims against them with prejudice. Co-Defendants SBE Entertainment Group, BE Las Vegas Holdings I, LLC and SBEHG Las Vegas I, LLC join the petition to confirm the contractual arbitration award. The unopposed petition is granted.

Here, the petition complies with the requirements of Code of Civil Procedure Section 1285 et. seq.. The agreement to arbitrate is attached to the petition. (Petition, Attachment 4(b).) The petition also sets forth that the arbitration was conducted by a panel consisting of United States District Judge (Ret.) Gary A. Feess; Mr. Richard Chernick, Esq.; and Mr. Barry A. Drucker, Esq. (Petition, ¶ 6.) A copy of the arbitration award dismissing the claims against moving Defendants is attached to the petition. (Petition, Attachment 8(c).)

The award requires all claims against Defendants Stockbridge Capital Group, LLC, Las Vegas Resort Investment Co., LLC, SBE Voteco Co., LLC, SBE Entertainment Group, SBE Las Vegas Holdings I, LLC and SBEHG Las Vegas I, LLC be dismissed with prejudice.

Accordingly, the Court grants the petition and will prepare an order of dismissal dismissing moving and joining defendants from the action with prejudice.