This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/23/2023 at 06:34:21 (UTC).

HONG KONG RUIDA FLYING AVIATION TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD. VS INFINITY AIR, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/04/2022 HONG KONG RUIDA FLYING AVIATION TECHNOLOGY CO , LTD filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against INFINITY AIR, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL L. STERN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5208

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL L. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HONG KONG RUIDA FLYING AVIATION TECHNOLOGY CO. LTD.

Defendants

ALLFLIGHT CORPORATION

INFINITY AIR INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PLATT DANIEL A.

BEDDINGFIELD DAVID J.

Defendant Attorney

RAHBAN MICHELLE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE; CASE MANAGEM...)

3/17/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE; CASE MANAGEM...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE; CASE MANAGEM...) OF 03/17/2023, FINAL TRIAL PREPARATION

3/17/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE; CASE MANAGEM...) OF 03/17/2023, FINAL TRIAL PREPARATION

Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PARTIAL DEMURRER OF INFINITY AIR, INC., AND ALLFLIGHT CORP. TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF HONG KONG RUIDA FLYING AVIATION TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD.

3/10/2023: Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PARTIAL DEMURRER OF INFINITY AIR, INC., AND ALLFLIGHT CORP. TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF HONG KONG RUIDA FLYING AVIATION TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD.

Request for Judicial Notice

3/6/2023: Request for Judicial Notice

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF HONG KONG RUIDA FLYING AVIATION TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD.S OPPOSITION TO THE PARTIAL DEMURER OF DEFENDANTS INFINITY AIR, INC., AND ALLFLIGHT CORP. TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AME

3/6/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF HONG KONG RUIDA FLYING AVIATION TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD.S OPPOSITION TO THE PARTIAL DEMURER OF DEFENDANTS INFINITY AIR, INC., AND ALLFLIGHT CORP. TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AME

Case Management Statement

3/2/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/2/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

3/1/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

2/17/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

2/14/2023: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHELLE A. RAHBAN IN SUPPORT OF GENERAL DEMURRER OF INFINITY AIR, INC. AND ALLFLIGHT CORP. TO COMPLAINT OF HONG KONG RUIDA FLYING AVIATION TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD.

2/14/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHELLE A. RAHBAN IN SUPPORT OF GENERAL DEMURRER OF INFINITY AIR, INC. AND ALLFLIGHT CORP. TO COMPLAINT OF HONG KONG RUIDA FLYING AVIATION TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD.

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/17/2023

1/17/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/17/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

1/17/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

1/13/2023: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/25/2022

10/25/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/25/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

10/25/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHELLE A. RAHBAN IN SUPPORT OF GENERAL DEMURRER OF INFINITY AIR, INC. TO COMPLAINT OF HONG KONG RUIDA FLYING AVIATION TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD.

10/24/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHELLE A. RAHBAN IN SUPPORT OF GENERAL DEMURRER OF INFINITY AIR, INC. TO COMPLAINT OF HONG KONG RUIDA FLYING AVIATION TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD.

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

10/24/2022: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2023
  • Hearing11/27/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2023
  • Hearing11/16/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Demurrer - without Motion to Strike: Filed By: Infinity Air, Inc. (Defendant),Allflight Corporation (Defendant); Result: Sustained without Leave to Amend ; Result Date: 03/17/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/27/2023 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/16/2023 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Case Managem...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Case Managem...) of 03/17/2023, Final Trial Preparation; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for 03/17/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 updated: Result Date to 03/17/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/17/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 updated: Result Date to 03/17/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketReply In Support Of Partial Demurrer of Infinity Air, Inc., And Allflight Corp. To First Amended Complaint Of Hong Kong Ruida Flying Aviation Technology Co., LTD. Filed by: Infinity Air, Inc. (Defendant); Allflight Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/11/2022 at 10:15 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Hong Kong Ruida Flying Aviation Technology Co., Ltd. (Plaintiff); As to: Infinity Air, Inc. (Defendant); Allflight Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Hong Kong Ruida Flying Aviation Technology Co., Ltd. (Plaintiff); As to: Infinity Air, Inc. (Defendant); Allflight Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Hong Kong Ruida Flying Aviation Technology Co., Ltd. (Plaintiff); As to: Infinity Air, Inc. (Defendant); Allflight Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael L. Stern in Department 62 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less