This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/31/2019 at 00:20:33 (UTC).

HONDA TRADING AMERICA CORP VS ROBERT FARRIS EHRLICH ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/07/2017 HONDA TRADING AMERICA CORP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ROBERT FARRIS EHRLICH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL P. LINFIELD and AMY D. HOGUE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4245

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL P. LINFIELD

AMY D. HOGUE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner, Cross Defendant and Not Classified By Court

HONDA TRADING AMERICA CORPORATION

Defendants, Respondents and Not Classified By Court

APB & ASSOCIATES

EHRLICH ROBERT FARRIS

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

APB & ASSOCIATES INC. (DOE 1)

HONNELL DARRIN

APB & ASSOCIATES INC. DOE 1

HONDA TRADING AMERICA CORPORATION

Defendants, Respondents, Cross Plaintiffs and Not Classified By Court

EHRLICH ROBERT FARRIS

APB & ASSOCIATES INC. (DOE 1)

APB & ASSOCIATES INC. DOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MEYLAN DAVITT JAIN AREVIAN & KIM LLP

MEYLAN ROBERT L.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

GLAZER RUSSELL I. ESQ.

APB & ASSOCIATES INC. (DOE 1)

GLAZER RUSSELL IRA

GLAZER RUSSELL I.

 

Court Documents

Opposition

7/22/2019: Opposition

Jury Instructions

7/9/2019: Jury Instructions

Proof of Service by Mail

2/1/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Substitution of Attorney

1/17/2019: Substitution of Attorney

DECLARATION OF RUSSELL I. GLAZER IN OPPOSITION TO HONDA?S MOTION TO QUASH DOCUMENT SUBPOENA TO BASF

7/25/2018: DECLARATION OF RUSSELL I. GLAZER IN OPPOSITION TO HONDA?S MOTION TO QUASH DOCUMENT SUBPOENA TO BASF

Notice of Motion

10/23/2018: Notice of Motion

Minute Order

11/28/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION BY DEFENDANT DARRIN HONNELL; AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

8/10/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION BY DEFENDANT DARRIN HONNELL; AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF RUSSELL I. GLAZER

4/17/2018: DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF RUSSELL I. GLAZER

PLAINTIFF HONDA TRADING AMERICA CORPORATION'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT ?1

4/23/2018: PLAINTIFF HONDA TRADING AMERICA CORPORATION'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT ?1

ORDER GRANTING LEAVE FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/25/2018: ORDER GRANTING LEAVE FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT

APB'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH DOCUMENT SUBPOENA TO BASF

6/25/2018: APB'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH DOCUMENT SUBPOENA TO BASF

DECLARATION OF DARRIN HONNELL IN OPPOSITION TO HONDA TRADING'S APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

9/25/2017: DECLARATION OF DARRIN HONNELL IN OPPOSITION TO HONDA TRADING'S APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/14/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

9/12/2017: ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION AND HEARING

9/14/2017: NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION AND HEARING

APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

9/14/2017: APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

9/14/2017: APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

177 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 34; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter (Brenda Sanches (#13019)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • Stipulation Re: Jury (Civil Trials); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • Exhibit List; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • Reply (to HTA Pocket Brief); Filed by Darrin Honnell (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • Reply (to Defendant Darrin Honnell to Appear at Trial and Produce Documents); Filed by Darrin Honnell (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • Brief (PLAINTIFF HONDA TRADING AMERICA CORPORATION?S POCKET BRIEF re DEFENDANT?S REQUESTED EXCLUSION OF EVIDENCE RELATING TO JEDD LLC); Filed by Honda Trading America Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • at 11:56 AM in Department 34; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 34; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 34; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal of Ehrlich & APB & Associates, Inc.) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
308 More Docket Entries
  • 07/05/2017
  • NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND EX PARTE APPLICATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; AND ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • DECLARATION OF RUSSELL I. GLAZER IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO EXTEND THE DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Honda Trading America Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • COMPLAINT: (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; (2) BREACH OF CONTRACT FOR SALE OF GOODS; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Honda Trading America Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HONDA TRADING AMERICA CORPORATION is a litigant