This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/23/2021 at 19:41:38 (UTC).

HOME EXPO FINANCIAL INC., AS TRUSTEE OF LAUREL CANYON TRUST DATED 4/20/2017 VS SAMUEL OVALLE

Case Summary

On 02/24/2020 HOME EXPO FINANCIAL INC , AS TRUSTEE OF LAUREL CANYON TRUST DATED 4/20/2017 filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SAMUEL OVALLE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN P. PFAHLER. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0140

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN P. PFAHLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOME EXPO FINANCIAL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AS TRUSTEE OF LAUREL CANYON TRUST

Defendant

OVALLE SAMUEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PALOCI HENRY

 

Court Documents

Proof of Publication

1/12/2021: Proof of Publication

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

1/28/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

2/2/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Summary of the Case

3/9/2021: Summary of the Case

Request for Dismissal

3/9/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/9/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Case Management Statement

3/9/2021: Case Management Statement

Default Judgment - DEFAULT JUDGMENT QUIET TITLE

3/16/2021: Default Judgment - DEFAULT JUDGMENT QUIET TITLE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT AND...) OF 03/16/2021, MINUTE ORDER

3/16/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT AND...) OF 03/16/2021, MINUTE ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT AND...)

3/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT AND...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS, INCLUDING DISMISSAL/MONETA...)

10/26/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS, INCLUDING DISMISSAL/MONETA...)

Reply - REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

10/19/2020: Reply - REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

Case Management Statement

10/19/2020: Case Management Statement

Order for Publication

9/10/2020: Order for Publication

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/27/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

7/9/2020: Case Management Statement

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/24/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/25/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department F49, Stephen P. Pfahler, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (Re Submission of Proposed Judgment) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketDefault Judgment (Quieting Title); Filed by Home Expo Financial, Inc. a California corporation, as Trustee of Laurel Canyon Trust Dated 4/20/2017 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F49, Stephen P. Pfahler, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F49, Stephen P. Pfahler, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Default and Default Judgment) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Default Prove up Hearing Order to Show Cause Re: Default and...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Default Prove up Hearing Order to Show Cause Re: Default and...) of 03/16/2021, Minute order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketSummary of the Case; Filed by Home Expo Financial, Inc. a California corporation, as Trustee of Laurel Canyon Trust Dated 4/20/2017 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Home Expo Financial, Inc. a California corporation, as Trustee of Laurel Canyon Trust Dated 4/20/2017 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (as to all does); Filed by Home Expo Financial, Inc. a California corporation, as Trustee of Laurel Canyon Trust Dated 4/20/2017 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Home Expo Financial, Inc. a California corporation, as Trustee of Laurel Canyon Trust Dated 4/20/2017 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketOrder for Publication; Filed by Home Expo Financial, Inc. a California corporation, as Trustee of Laurel Canyon Trust Dated 4/20/2017 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketApplication for Publication; Filed by Home Expo Financial, Inc. a California corporation, as Trustee of Laurel Canyon Trust Dated 4/20/2017 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F49, Stephen P. Pfahler, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Home Expo Financial, Inc. a California corporation, as Trustee of Laurel Canyon Trust Dated 4/20/2017 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Home Expo Financial, Inc. a California corporation, as Trustee of Laurel Canyon Trust Dated 4/20/2017 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Home Expo Financial, Inc. a California corporation, as Trustee of Laurel Canyon Trust Dated 4/20/2017 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Home Expo Financial, Inc. a California corporation, as Trustee of Laurel Canyon Trust Dated 4/20/2017 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOME EXPO FINANCIAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PALOCI HENRY