This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/20/2020 at 06:47:25 (UTC).

HOME EXPO FINANCIAL INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, AS TRUSTEE OF VAN NUYS TRUST DATED 10/23/2019 VS KATHY MONTANO

Case Summary

On 05/01/2020 HOME EXPO FINANCIAL INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, AS TRUSTEE OF VAN NUYS TRUST DATED 10/23/2019 filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against KATHY MONTANO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0535

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOME EXPO FINANCIAL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AS TRUSTEE OF VAN NUYS TRUST

Defendant

MONTANO KATHY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PALOCI HENRY

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

5/18/2020: Request for Dismissal

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/1/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/1/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/1/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/1/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

5/1/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Home Expo Financial Inc., a California corporation, as Trustee of Van Nuys Trust Dated 10/23/2019 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Home Expo Financial Inc., a California corporation, as Trustee of Van Nuys Trust Dated 10/23/2019 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Home Expo Financial Inc., a California corporation, as Trustee of Van Nuys Trust Dated 10/23/2019 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Home Expo Financial Inc., a California corporation, as Trustee of Van Nuys Trust Dated 10/23/2019 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOME EXPO FINANCIAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PALOCI HENRY