This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/07/2019 at 01:34:30 (UTC).

HOMAYOUN KESHAVARZI VS MILLER AUTOMOTIVE GROUP INC.

Case Summary

On 03/22/2018 HOMAYOUN KESHAVARZI filed a Labor - Wage Claim lawsuit against MILLER AUTOMOTIVE GROUP INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RUPERT A. BYRDSONG, FRANK J. JOHNSON and MICHAEL J. CONVEY. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0080

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wage Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RUPERT A. BYRDSONG

FRANK J. JOHNSON

MICHAEL J. CONVEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KESHAVARZI HOMAYOUN

Defendants and Not Classified By Court

MERCEDES-BENZ OF BEVERLY HILLS

MILLER AUTOMOTIVE GROUP INC.

MILLER AUTOMOTIVE GROUP INC. DBA MERCEDES-BENZ OF BEVERLY HILLS

STATE LABOR COMMISSIONER

Commissioner and Not Classified By Court

STATE LABOR COMMISSIONER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SABZEVAR F. MICHAEL

SABZEVAR FARZAD MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

LOW NATHAN K.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/22/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Legacy Document

3/22/2018: Legacy Document

Appeal of Labor Commissioner Award

3/22/2018: Appeal of Labor Commissioner Award

Legacy Document

4/11/2018: Legacy Document

Notice

4/24/2018: Notice

Notice

4/24/2018: Notice

Notice

4/24/2018: Notice

Legacy Document

5/25/2018: Legacy Document

Request for Dismissal

12/10/2018: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order

10/31/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

9/10/2018: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department U, Michael J. Convey, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Homayoun Keshavarzi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department U, Michael J. Convey, Presiding; (OSC-Dismissal) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • Minute Order ( (Legacy Event Type : OSC-Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • at 08:33 AM in Department U; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-09-10 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • at 08:33 AM in Department U; (Hearing De Novo Per Sec 98.2(A) Lc; Continued-by Stipulation) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-05-30 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Stipulation; Filed by Homayoun Keshavarzi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • Notice (of Hearing De Novo); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • Notice (of Hearing De Novo); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • Notice of Hearing of Motion for New Trial; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • Ntc of Hrng sent w/Cert/Mailing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • Notice (of Hearing De Novo); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Miller Automotive Group, Inc. (Defendant); Mercedes-Benz of Beverly Hills (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • Appeal of Labor Commissioner Award; Filed by Homayoun Keshavarzi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • Summons-Issued; Filed by Homayoun Keshavarzi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Homayoun Keshavarzi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERCEDES-BENZ OF BEVERLY HILLS is a litigant

Latest cases where MILLER AUTOMOTIVE GROUP INC. (DOE 1) is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE LABOR COMMISSIONER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer F. Michael Sabzevar