This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/02/2019 at 01:58:34 (UTC).

HOLMES LIVING TRUST

Case Summary

On 06/27/2018 HOLMES LIVING TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WADA, ROBERT S and CHRISTIAN, DEBORAH L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5939

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WADA, ROBERT S

CHRISTIAN, DEBORAH L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HOLMES RUTH A.

Respondent

HOLMES SUSAN

Trustee

HOLMES SUSAN C.

Not Classified By Court

HOLMES LIVING TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

PARKE JOHN HOWARD

SWEENEY JAMES MICHAEL

Respondent Attorney

KASS BRADLEY MARK

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

6/11/2019: Minute Order

Withdrawal - Petitioner Ruth Holmes' Withdrawal of Petition

5/24/2019: Withdrawal - Petitioner Ruth Holmes' Withdrawal of Petition

PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

5/17/2019: PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

Rejected Proposed Order

5/17/2019: Rejected Proposed Order

Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) - To Compel Trustee, Trustee To Account, To Instruct Trustee, And To Surcharge And Remove Trustee

6/27/2018: Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) - To Compel Trustee, Trustee To Account, To Instruct Trustee, And To Surcharge And Remove Trustee

Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing on Petition to Compel Trustee to Account

7/6/2018: Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing on Petition to Compel Trustee to Account

Notice - Continuance - Notice of Continued Hearing

9/7/2018: Notice - Continuance - Notice of Continued Hearing

Minute Order

9/7/2018: Minute Order

Order - Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Petition to Compel Trustee to Account, to Instruct Trustee, and to Surcharge and Remove Trustee from September 7, 2018 to December 14, 2018, Order

9/12/2018: Order - Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Petition to Compel Trustee to Account, to Instruct Trustee, and to Surcharge and Remove Trustee from September 7, 2018 to December 14, 2018, Order

PR_General Probate - Stipulation and Order

12/7/2018: PR_General Probate - Stipulation and Order

Notice - Continuance - Notice of Continued Hearing and of Order Directing Trustee to Account

12/14/2018: Notice - Continuance - Notice of Continued Hearing and of Order Directing Trustee to Account

Minute Order

12/14/2018: Minute Order

Stipulation and Order

12/24/2018: Stipulation and Order

Probate Minute Order - Probate Master Minute Order

3/8/2019: Probate Minute Order - Probate Master Minute Order

Minute Order

5/7/2019: Minute Order

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2019
  • Docketin Probate Department 99, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketPetition Denied (Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) filed on June 27, 2018 by Ruth A. Holmes. )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketDISP: Denied-Initial Petition-Before Crt Hrg/Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketWithdrawal (Petitioner Ruth Holmes' Withdrawal of Petition ); Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketRejected Proposed Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Docketin Probate Department 99, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Docketin Probate Department 99, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2018
  • Docketin Probate Department 99, Wada, Robert S, Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketNotice - Continuance (Notice of Continued Hearing and of Order Directing Trustee to Account ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • DocketOrder (Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Petition to Compel Trustee to Account, to Instruct Trustee, and to Surcharge and Remove Trustee from September 7, 2018 to December 14, 2018, Order ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • Docketin Probate Department 99, Wada, Robert S, Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketNotice - Continuance (Notice of Continued Hearing )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing on Petition to Compel Trustee to Account ); Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketPetition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) (To Compel Trustee, Trustee To Account, To Instruct Trustee, And To Surcharge And Remove Trustee ); Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) (Probate Case Coversheet )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less