Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/30/2021 at 09:42:59 (UTC).

HOLLY ZUCKER VS STREETSLA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/06/2020 HOLLY ZUCKER filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STREETSLA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE, SERENA R. MURILLO and CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2693

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

SERENA R. MURILLO

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZUCKER HOLLY

Defendants

STREETSLA

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC WORKS

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CARPENTER JOHN C

CARPENTER JOHN CHARLES ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

HURRELL THOMAS C.

HURRELL THOMAS CHARLES ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

4/2/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/1/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

3/1/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Case Management Statement

3/1/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/19/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF HOLLY ZUCKER'S UNTIMELY OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER

2/8/2021: Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF HOLLY ZUCKER'S UNTIMELY OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER AND REASSIGNMENT OF COMPLICATED PERS...)

2/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER AND REASSIGNMENT OF COMPLICATED PERS...)

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

1/8/2021: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/6/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/9/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/9/2020: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

11/16/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/16/2020: Proof of Personal Service

PI General Order

11/30/2020: PI General Order

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/14/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION RE DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES AND DEFENDANT STREETSLA

12/23/2020: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION RE DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES AND DEFENDANT STREETSLA

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/9/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2021
  • Hearing06/22/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by HOLLY ZUCKER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by HOLLY ZUCKER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (- Defendants County of Los Angeles, and County of Los Angeles Department of Public Works's Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint/case trans. to dept. N) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Reassignment); Filed by HOLLY ZUCKER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Defendant); COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC WORKS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Defendant); COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC WORKS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by HOLLY ZUCKER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by HOLLY ZUCKER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by HOLLY ZUCKER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by HOLLY ZUCKER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by HOLLY ZUCKER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by HOLLY ZUCKER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by HOLLY ZUCKER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STCV42693    Hearing Date: March 24, 2021    Dept: 29

20STCV42693 Holly Zucker v. StreetsLA, et al.

Court Order Re: Transfer and Reassignment of Complicated Personal Injury (“PI”) Case to An Independent Calendar ("IC") Courtroom from Department 29, a PI Hub Court.

AFTER REVIEW OF THE FILE, THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING ORDER:

Department 29 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above-entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented.

At the direction of Department 1, this case is hereby ordered reassigned and transferred to the West District, Santa Monica, the Honorable Craig D. Karlan, Judge presiding in Department N for all purposes except trial. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the cause for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.

ANY pending motions or hearings, including trial or status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar Court. (NOTE:  ALL HEARINGS currently set in Department 29 of the Spring Street Courthouse are taken off calendar subject to being reset and notified by the receiving court Re:  New hearing dates.)

Judicial Assistant is directed to give notice to Plaintiff, who upon receipt of this notice, is ordered to give notice to all parties of record.

Case Number: 20STCV42693    Hearing Date: February 11, 2021    Dept: 29

20STCV42693 Holly Zucker v. StreetsLA, et al.

Court Order Re: Transfer and Reassignment of Complicated Personal Injury (“PI”) Case to An Independent Calendar ("IC") Courtroom from Department 29, a PI Hub Court.

AFTER REVIEW OF THE FILE, THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING ORDER:

Department 29 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above-entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented.

At the direction of Department 1, this case is hereby ordered reassigned and transferred to the West District, Santa Monica, the Honorable Craig D. Karlan, Judge presiding in Department N for all purposes except trial. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the cause for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.

ANY pending motions or hearings, including trial or status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar Court. (NOTE:  ALL HEARINGS currently set in Department 29 of the Spring Street Courthouse are taken off calendar subject to being reset and notified by the receiving court Re:  New hearing dates.)

Judicial Assistant is directed to give notice to Plaintiff, who upon receipt of this notice, is ordered to give notice to all parties of record.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARPENTER JOHN C. ESQ.