Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/18/2021 at 00:15:14 (UTC).

HOK, CORYNAH VS DERIEUX, PIERRE EMIR

Case Summary

On 01/13/2021 HOK, CORYNAH filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against DERIEUX, PIERRE EMIR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VEASEY, GLENDA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0017

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

VEASEY, GLENDA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HOK CORYNAH

Respondent

DERIEUX PIERRE EMIR

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

2/17/2021: Minute Order

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

1/28/2021: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

1/28/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

1/28/2021: Minute Order

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

1/13/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

1/13/2021: Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - - Granted

1/13/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - - Granted

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department J, Veasey, Glenda, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department J, Veasey, Glenda, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Not Held - Continued by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketRequest to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (- Granted ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less