This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/07/2022 at 11:27:29 (UTC).

HODDA TAHERI VS UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/30/2018 HODDA TAHERI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. SEIGLE, EDWARD B. MORETON, WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT and EDWARD B. MORETON, JR.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5644

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

EDWARD B. MORETON

EDWARD B. MORETON, JR.

LAURA A. SEIGLE

WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TAHERI HODDA

Defendants

UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY

BROMBERG MARC

DEOS 1-40

UNION PACIFIC CORP.

NAGY DANIEL

Respondent and Defendant

UNION PACIFIC CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

BEDIRIAN & ASSOCIATES

ZOGRABIAN ERIK

BEDIRIAN SARA

Defendant Attorneys

GIBBONS ROBERT JOHN

FLESHER JACOB D.

ROBERTS STACEY LYNN

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

7/30/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

5/13/2022: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal

4/21/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Ruling

1/18/2022: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

1/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Ruling

8/30/2021: Notice of Ruling

Order - Dismissal

8/26/2021: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS MARC BROMBERG...)

8/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS MARC BROMBERG...)

Association of Attorney

7/9/2021: Association of Attorney

Notice of Ruling

7/12/2021: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS MARC BROMBERG...)

7/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS MARC BROMBERG...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL O...)

5/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL O...)

Notice of Ruling

5/11/2021: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling

1/8/2021: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

1/15/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Substitution of Attorney

1/15/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS MARC BROMBERG...)

1/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS MARC BROMBERG...)

Notice of Ruling

11/18/2020: Notice of Ruling

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Hodda Taheri (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Hodda Taheri (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Hodda Taheri (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (of defendants Marc Bromberg and Daniel Nagy for Failure to file Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4B; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Hodda Taheri (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Hodda Taheri (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNION PACIFIC CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where Union Pacific Railroad Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GIBBONS ROBERT JOHN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBERTS STACEY LYNN