Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/05/2021 at 15:20:30 (UTC).

H.K.Z ENTERPRISES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS BARKLEY TIRE AMERICAS LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/20/2020 H K Z ENTERPRISES, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BARKLEY TIRE AMERICAS LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD L. FRUIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1834

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD L. FRUIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

H.K.Z ENTERPRISES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA RON'S TIRE AND WHEEL

H.K.Z ENTERPRISES INC. DBA RON'S TIRE AND WHEEL

Defendants

BARKLEY TIRE AND SERVICE A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

MARTINEZ SHAWN

DING SIYUAN

MARTINEZ LOUIE

BARKLEY TIRE AMERICAS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

ZHONG LICHAO

MARTINEZ MICHAEL

BARKLEY TIRE AMERICAS LLC

BARKLEY TIRE AND SERVICE

BARKLEY TIRE AMERICAS LLC DBA BARLEY TIRE AND SERVICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KUO HUBERT H.

Defendant Attorneys

PEARSON MICHAEL

WARSHAW DANIEL

PEARSON MICHAEL H.

WARSHAW DANIEL L.

HSU ROGER C.

 

Court Documents

Request for Refund / Order

3/18/2021: Request for Refund / Order

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER PROTECTIVE ORDER

2/18/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER PROTECTIVE ORDER

Case Management Statement

12/23/2020: Case Management Statement

Substitution of Attorney

11/24/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

11/24/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

11/24/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11/4/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF BRIAN P. STEWART

10/16/2020: Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF BRIAN P. STEWART

Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF DAVID YU

10/16/2020: Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF DAVID YU

Notice of Appearance

10/13/2020: Notice of Appearance

Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA RE NOTICE OF HEARING RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/5/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA RE NOTICE OF HEARING RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/23/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

9/14/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/14/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/14/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/14/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/14/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/14/2020: Proof of Personal Service

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • Hearing10/04/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 15 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • Hearing09/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 15 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketRequest for Refund / Order; Filed by Barkley Tire Americas LLC, dba Barkley Tire and Service Erroneously Sued As Barkley Tire Americas LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Protective Order - Redline Version); Filed by Barkley Tire Americas LLC, dba Barkley Tire and Service Erroneously Sued As Barkley Tire Americas LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Protective Order); Filed by Barkley Tire Americas LLC, dba Barkley Tire and Service Erroneously Sued As Barkley Tire Americas LLC (Defendant); Barkley Tire and Service (Defendant); Louie Martinez (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by H.K.Z Enterprises, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Lichao Zhong (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Shawn Martinez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by H.K.Z Enterprises, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by H.K.Z Enterprises, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by H.K.Z Enterprises, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by H.K.Z Enterprises, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by H.K.Z Enterprises, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by H.K.Z Enterprises, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by H.K.Z Enterprises, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by H.K.Z Enterprises, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by H.K.Z Enterprises, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where H.K.Z ENTERPRISES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA RON'S TIRE AND WHEEL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KUO HUBERT H. ESQ.