This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/26/2019 at 03:31:48 (UTC).

HITE, GENETTE - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 05/05/2017 HITE, GENETTE - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HOUSE, MARY THORNTON. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3918

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HOUSE, MARY THORNTON

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CARTER MARY RAE

Claimants

BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

CAPITAL ONE N.A.

WELLS FARGO BANK N.A.

SYNCHRONY BANK CARE CREDIT CORE DENTAL

CITY OF LONG BEACH

Decedent

HITE GENETTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LEWELLYN LARRY DARRYL

 

Court Documents

Withdrawal - Creditor's Claim - Wells Fargo Bank

6/4/2018: Withdrawal - Creditor's Claim - Wells Fargo Bank

Notice - Death - to Department of Health Care Srevices

8/15/2017: Notice - Death - to Department of Health Care Srevices

Creditor's Claim

10/24/2017: Creditor's Claim

Notice - Hearing

3/29/2018: Notice - Hearing

Inventory & Appraisal - Supplemental

4/19/2018: Inventory & Appraisal - Supplemental

Order - Proposed Order

7/27/2017: Order - Proposed Order

Withdrawal - Creditor's Claim - City of Long Beach

6/4/2018: Withdrawal - Creditor's Claim - City of Long Beach

Waiver - (No Fee) - Of Detailed Account Per California Probate Code Ssection 10954; Waiver Of Notice; and Consent To Approval Of Report As Prayed

3/28/2018: Waiver - (No Fee) - Of Detailed Account Per California Probate Code Ssection 10954; Waiver Of Notice; and Consent To Approval Of Report As Prayed

Creditor's Claim

10/23/2017: Creditor's Claim

Minute Order

6/6/2018: Minute Order

Waiver - (No Fee) - Of Detailed Account Per California Probate Code Ssection 10954; Waiver Of Notice; and Consent To Approval Of Report As Prayed

3/28/2018: Waiver - (No Fee) - Of Detailed Account Per California Probate Code Ssection 10954; Waiver Of Notice; and Consent To Approval Of Report As Prayed

Waiver - (No Fee) - Of Detailed Account Per California Probate Code Ssection 10954; Waiver Of Notice; and Consent To Approval Of Report As Prayed

3/28/2018: Waiver - (No Fee) - Of Detailed Account Per California Probate Code Ssection 10954; Waiver Of Notice; and Consent To Approval Of Report As Prayed

Will - Admitted

6/7/2017: Will - Admitted

Supplement - Supplement to Petition for Letters Testamentary

6/6/2017: Supplement - Supplement to Petition for Letters Testamentary

Withdrawal - Creditor's Claim - Bank of America

6/12/2018: Withdrawal - Creditor's Claim - Bank of America

Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order

7/26/2018: Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order

Acknowledgment of Receipt

7/26/2018: Acknowledgment of Receipt

Supplement - Second Supplement

6/4/2018: Supplement - Second Supplement

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2018
  • Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Receipt; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Receipt; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Receipt; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Receipt; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Receipt; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Receipt; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • Order (Order Approving First and Final Report )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • Withdrawal - Creditor's Claim (Bank of America ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 06/13/2017
  • Creditor's Claim; Filed by Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • in Probate Department 29, House, Mary Thornton, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • Will (Admitted )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • DISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • Supplement (Supplement to Petition for Letters Testamentary ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • Proof of Publication; Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • Notice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Petition - Probate of Will (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less