Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2021 at 01:27:40 (UTC).

HIRECLOUT, INC. VS LARK TECHNOLOGIES, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/05/2021 HIRECLOUT, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LARK TECHNOLOGIES, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4674

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HIRECLOUT INC.

Defendant

LARK TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOYDSTON BRIAN DONALD

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

5/26/2021: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service

3/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/5/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/5/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/5/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/8/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Hireclout, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Hireclout, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Hireclout, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Hireclout, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Hireclout, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOYDSTON BRIAN DONALD