This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/26/2023 at 04:23:49 (UTC).

HIPOLITO SAAVEDRA MENA, ET AL. VS NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/28/2022 HIPOLITO SAAVEDRA MENA, filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VALERIE SALKIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1785

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

VALERIE SALKIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SAAVEDRA JASMINE

SAAVEDRA MENA HIPOLITO

Defendants

LAD-N LLC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA LITHIA NISSAN OF DOWNTOWN LA

NISSAN NORTH AMERICA INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIRNOS ROGER

Defendant Attorney

CRITCHLOW EVAN J.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/23/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

3/8/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

3/6/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/6/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Substitution of Attorney

2/22/2023: Substitution of Attorney

Answer

12/5/2022: Answer

Answer

12/5/2022: Answer

Notice - NOTICE SAAVEDRA MENA, HIPOLITO SAAVEDRA, JASMINE V. NNA NTC OF CMC

12/5/2022: Notice - NOTICE SAAVEDRA MENA, HIPOLITO SAAVEDRA, JASMINE V. NNA NTC OF CMC

Proof of Personal Service

11/14/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/14/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

11/1/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/1/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/01/2022

11/1/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/01/2022

Demand for Jury Trial

10/28/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/28/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/28/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

10/28/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/28/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2023
  • Hearing06/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department U at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 06/22/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); LAD-N, LLC d/b/a NISSAN OF DOWNTOWN LA Erroneously Sued As LAD-N, LLC, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: HIPOLITO SAAVEDRA MENA (Plaintiff); JASMINE SAAVEDRA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: HIPOLITO SAAVEDRA MENA (Plaintiff); JASMINE SAAVEDRA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: LAD-N, LLC d/b/a NISSAN OF DOWNTOWN LA Erroneously Sued As LAD-N, LLC, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketAddress for Evan J. Critchlow (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketNotice Saavedra Mena, Hipolito Saavedra, Jasmine v. NNA Ntc of CMC; Filed by: HIPOLITO SAAVEDRA MENA (Plaintiff); JASMINE SAAVEDRA (Plaintiff); As to: NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: LAD-N, LLC d/b/a NISSAN OF DOWNTOWN LA Erroneously Sued As LAD-N, LLC, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 11/01/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: HIPOLITO SAAVEDRA MENA (Plaintiff); JASMINE SAAVEDRA (Plaintiff); As to: NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); LAD-N, LLC, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: HIPOLITO SAAVEDRA MENA (Plaintiff); JASMINE SAAVEDRA (Plaintiff); As to: NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); LAD-N, LLC, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: HIPOLITO SAAVEDRA MENA (Plaintiff); JASMINE SAAVEDRA (Plaintiff); As to: NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); LAD-N, LLC, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: HIPOLITO SAAVEDRA MENA (Plaintiff); JASMINE SAAVEDRA (Plaintiff); As to: NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); LAD-N, LLC, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less