This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/17/2019 at 20:58:42 (UTC).

HILLSTAR INSURANCE COMPANY VS KYLA ASHLEY REEF ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/08/2017 HILLSTAR INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KYLA ASHLEY REEF. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0476

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

HILLSTAR INSURANCE COMPANY

Respondents and Defendants

REEF KYLA ASHLEY

DOES 1 TO 20

SEIDEN DARYL R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

YOUNG SARA ESQ.

YOUNG SARA

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

5/9/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

5/9/2019: Unknown

Notice

11/5/2018: Notice

Minute Order

10/22/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/29/2017: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

10/30/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

10/30/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

10/5/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

10/5/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/29/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/29/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for Failure to Enter Default Judgment) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Enter Defaul...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Enter Defaul...) of 05/09/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • DocketNotice (Of Ruling Re: Final Status Conference); Filed by Hillstar Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-10-22 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • Docketat 1:45 PM in Department 93; Court Order (Court Order; Court makes order) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Hillstar Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Hillstar Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****0476    Hearing Date: September 22, 2020    Dept: 28

Request for Default Judgment

Having considered all documents submitted in support of an application for default judgment, the Court rules as follows.

BACKGROUND

On May 8, 2017, Plaintiff Hillstar Insurance Company (“Plaintiff”) filed a complaint against Defendants Kyla Ashley Reef and Daryl R. Seiden (collectively “Defendants”) alleging negligence for an automobile collision that occurred on July 12, 2015.

On October 30, 2017, the Court entered default against Defendants.

On July 31, 2019, the Court dismissed Does 1-20 from Plaintiff’s complaint without prejudice.

On February 21, 2020, the Court denied an application Plaintiff filed in seeking default judgments against Defendants.

On June 3, 2020, Plaintiff filed an application for default judgment to be entered against Defendants.

On June 5, 2020, the Court, again, dismissed Does 1-20 from Plaintiff’s complaint without prejudice.

A Non-Appearance Case Review Default Judgment is scheduled for June 30, 2021.

PARTY’S REQUEST

Plaintiff requests the Court to enter a default judgment against Defendants and award Plaintiff $43,650.69.

DISCUSSION

The Court finds the application is properly approved. Plaintiff served statements of damages on Defendants over two months before the Court entered default against Defendants. Those statements of damages contain figures in excess of the damages sought against Defendants in the application at bar. Plaintiff has submitted sufficient evidence showing an entitlement to $33,244.03 in special damages. Plaintiff has provided an adequate calculation for prejudgment interest totaling $9,797.06. Plaintiff has satisfactorily explained its request for $609.60 in costs. As such, default judgment is properly awarded in Plaintiff’s favor and against Defendants for a total of $43,650.69.

CONCLUSION

The application for default judgment filed on June 3, 2020 is GRANTED.

Plaintiff is ordered to give notice of this ruling.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HILLSTER INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YOUNG SARA