This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/22/2022 at 03:24:28 (UTC).

HILLEL SHAMAM VS DANDOY GLASS COMPANY, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/10/2022 HILLEL SHAMAM filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DANDOY GLASS COMPANY, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8706

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHAMAM HILLEL

Defendants

DANDOY GLASS COMPANY INC.

JOHNSON COREY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARKER MICHAEL R

Defendant Attorney

KUTZ LAUREN B.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

3/10/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

3/10/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

3/10/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

3/10/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/10/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

3/10/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

3/10/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/10/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/10/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

3/10/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Demand for Jury Trial

6/7/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

6/7/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/7/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/23/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2025
  • Hearing03/06/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2023
  • Hearing09/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2023
  • Hearing08/24/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Dandoy Glass Company, Inc. (Defendant); Corey Johnson (Defendant); As to: Hillel Shamam (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Dandoy Glass Company, Inc. (Defendant); Corey Johnson (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Dandoy Glass Company, Inc. (Defendant); Corey Johnson (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Hillel Shamam (Plaintiff); As to: Dandoy Glass Company, Inc. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/22/2022; Service Cost: 114.15; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Hillel Shamam (Plaintiff); As to: Dandoy Glass Company, Inc. (Defendant); Corey Johnson (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 08/24/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 03/06/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Hillel Shamam (Plaintiff); As to: Dandoy Glass Company, Inc. (Defendant); Corey Johnson (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Hillel Shamam (Plaintiff); As to: Dandoy Glass Company, Inc. (Defendant); Corey Johnson (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARKER MICHAEL R.