This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/18/2018 at 19:25:42 (UTC).

HILLAIR CAPITAL MANAGEMENT LLC, VS. CONTENT CHECKED HOLDINGS

Case Summary

On 01/23/2017 HILLAIR CAPITAL MANAGEMENT LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CONTENT CHECKED HOLDINGS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6959

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HILLAIR CAPITAL MANAGEMENT LLC

Defendants

CONTENT CHECKED HOLDINGS INC.

DOES 1-20

CONTENT CHECKED INC.

CONTENT CHECKING INC. A WYOMING INC.

CONTENT CHECKED INC. A WYOMING CORP

CONTENT CHECKED HOLDING INC. A NEVADA

BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

Other

WEINBERG JOEL B.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPECTOR STEVEN M.

Defendant Attorney

MARTIN JOHN W.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2017
  • Notice (OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • Notice; Filed by Hillair Capital Management LLC, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • Notice; Filed by Hillair Capital Management LLC, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • Notice (OF ENTRY OF ORDERS ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department N; (OSC re Contempt; OSC Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • at 08:30 am in Department WEN, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; OSC re Contempt (2) OSC RE DISMISSAL) - OSC Discharged

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • Stipulation and Order (RE MODIFICATION TO RECEIVERSHIP ORDERS(TAX RETURNS) ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
135 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2017
  • Oath of Receiver; Filed by Receiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Hillair Capital Management LLC, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Hillair Capital Management LLC, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Hillair Capital Management LLC, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Hillair Capital Management LLC, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Hillair Capital Management LLC, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Hillair Capital Management LLC, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HILLAIR CAPITAL MANAGEMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SPECTOR STEVEN M. ESQ.