This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2022 at 03:49:14 (UTC).

HILL, JANICE MARIE VS CLEVELAND, TERRY

Case Summary

On 01/25/2021 HILL, JANICE MARIE filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against CLEVELAND, TERRY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PUENTE-PORRAS, MARIA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0088

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PUENTE-PORRAS, MARIA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HILL JANICE MARIE

Respondent

CLEVELAND TERRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

WINTERS JONATHAN DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Order - for Transcript

5/27/2021: Order - for Transcript

Opposition - to motion to deem

3/5/2021: Opposition - to motion to deem

Civil Case Cover Sheet - ADDENDUM

1/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - ADDENDUM

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

1/25/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

1/25/2021: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

1/25/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Petition - Civil Harassment (non-violence)

1/25/2021: Petition - Civil Harassment (non-violence)

Proof of Service

2/3/2021: Proof of Service

Request - Judicial Notice - in support of opposition to petitioner's 2nd petition for restraining order and in support of respondent's request for attorney's fees, costss as against petitioner & in su

2/5/2021: Request - Judicial Notice - in support of opposition to petitioner's 2nd petition for restraining order and in support of respondent's request for attorney's fees, costss as against petitioner & in su

Response - Civil Harassment (non-violence)

2/5/2021: Response - Civil Harassment (non-violence)

Request - Judicial Notice - in support of opposition to petitioner's 2nd petition for restraining order and in support of respondent's request for attorney's fees, costss as against petitioner & in su

2/5/2021: Request - Judicial Notice - in support of opposition to petitioner's 2nd petition for restraining order and in support of respondent's request for attorney's fees, costss as against petitioner & in su

Response - Civil Harassment (non-violence)

2/5/2021: Response - Civil Harassment (non-violence)

Motion - to deem petitioner a vexatious litigant; declaration of jonathan d winters in support thereof

2/5/2021: Motion - to deem petitioner a vexatious litigant; declaration of jonathan d winters in support thereof

Motion - to deem petitioner a vexatious litigant; declaration of jonathan d winters in support thereof

2/5/2021: Motion - to deem petitioner a vexatious litigant; declaration of jonathan d winters in support thereof

Minute Order

2/16/2021: Minute Order

Opposition - to motion to deem peititioner a vexatious litigant; memorandum of points and authorities in support thereof;declaration fo janice marie hill; proposed order

3/8/2021: Opposition - to motion to deem peititioner a vexatious litigant; memorandum of points and authorities in support thereof;declaration fo janice marie hill; proposed order

Proof of Service - Mail

3/9/2021: Proof of Service - Mail

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketOrder (for Transcript )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department S15, Puente-Porras, Maria, Presiding; Motion Hearing - Denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketNotice (Of 3/22/21 Hearing on Motion for Vexatious Litigant and Court Ruling ); Filed by Attorney for Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (REJECT ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketOpposition (to motion to deem peititioner a vexatious litigant; memorandum of points and authorities in support thereof;declaration fo janice marie hill; proposed order ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketOpposition (to motion to deem ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketMotion (to deem petitioner a vexatious litigant; declaration of jonathan d winters in support thereof ); Filed by Attorney for Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketResponse - Civil Harassment (non-violence); Filed by Attorney for Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketRequest - Judicial Notice (in support of opposition to petitioner's 2nd petition for restraining order and in support of respondent's request for attorney's fees, costss as against petitioner & in support of motion to deem petitioner a vexatious litigant ); Filed by Attorney for Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (ADDENDUM )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment (non-violence); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WINTERS JONATHAN D. ESQ.