This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/24/2022 at 05:04:13 (UTC).

HILDA NEWMAN VS AMERICAN GUARD SERVICES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/17/2022 HILDA NEWMAN filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against AMERICAN GUARD SERVICES, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0488

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEWMAN HILDA

Defendants

AMERICAN GUARD SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DAVENPORT JEROME

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ACOSTA TELLO SANDRA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/23/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

6/23/2022: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/17/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/17/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

6/17/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/17/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

6/30/2022: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2022
  • Hearing10/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Failure to Prosecute Case; Failure to File Request for Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • Hearing10/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by HILDA NEWMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by HILDA NEWMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by HILDA NEWMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by HILDA NEWMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN GUARD SERVICES INC. is a litigant