This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/28/2021 at 07:29:01 (UTC).

HILDA ESRAIL VS CALIFORNIA HOMECARE PHARMACY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 03/30/2021 HILDA ESRAIL filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CALIFORNIA HOMECARE PHARMACY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL P. VICENCIA. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0165

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL P. VICENCIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESRAIL HILDA

Defendant

CALIFORNIA HOMECARE PHARMACY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA EXCEPTIONAL HOME HEALTH CARE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEDVEI SEBASTIAN

Defendant Attorney

FISCH GREGG A.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement

6/4/2021: Notice of Settlement

Request for Dismissal

7/20/2021: Request for Dismissal

Answer

5/12/2021: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/19/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/6/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/06/2021

4/6/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/06/2021

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/30/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/30/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Related Case

4/2/2021: Notice of Related Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/2/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

4/2/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Hilda Esrail (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S26, Michael P. Vicencia, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by California Homecare Pharmacy, a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Answer to Plaintiff Hilda Esrail's Unverified Complaint; Filed by California Homecare Pharmacy, a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Hilda Esrail (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • Docketat 07:38 AM in Department S26, Michael P. Vicencia, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/06/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Hilda Esrail (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Hilda Esrail (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Hilda Esrail (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Hilda Esrail (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA HOMECARE PHARMACY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA EXCEPTIONAL HOME HEALTH CARE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FISCH, GREGG A.