This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/03/2021 at 15:34:44 (UTC).

HILARIO VASQUEZ, ET AL. VS WEST H & A LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/20/2021 HILARIO VASQUEZ filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against WEST H A LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0851

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VASQUEZ ELIA

VASQUEZ HILARIO

VASQUEZ OSCAR

Defendants

1-10 DOES

BELLAROSE INVESTMENTS LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION

WEST H & A LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MURPHY SUSAN MEDAGLIA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/1/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/20/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/20/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/20/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

8/20/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • Hearing12/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 36 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by HILARIO VASQUEZ (Plaintiff); OSCAR VASQUEZ (Plaintiff); ELIA VASQUEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by HILARIO VASQUEZ (Plaintiff); OSCAR VASQUEZ (Plaintiff); ELIA VASQUEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by HILARIO VASQUEZ (Plaintiff); OSCAR VASQUEZ (Plaintiff); ELIA VASQUEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WEST H&A LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MURPHY SUSAN M.