This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/19/2019 at 00:41:33 (UTC).

HIGHTOWER ASSOCIATES LLC VS ELEMENTS BEHAVIORAL HEALTH IN

Case Summary

On 08/14/2017 HIGHTOWER ASSOCIATES LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ELEMENTS BEHAVIORAL HEALTH IN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROSS KLEIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1325

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROSS KLEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HIGHTOWER ASSOCIATES LLC- AZ LLC

Defendants

DOES 1 - 100 INC.

ELEMENTS BEHAVIORAL HEALTH INC.-CA CORP

SAUER & WAGNER LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CAREY CARUSO LAW OFFICE OF

KOLETSKY MANCINI FELDMAN & MORROW

Defendant Attorney

SAUER & WAGNER LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department S27; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department S27; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department S27; Unknown Event Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy); Filed by SAUER & WAGNER LLP (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • First Amended Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • Notice; Filed by SAUER & WAGNER LLP (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Order; Filed by SAUER & WAGNER LLP (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Stipulation; Filed by SAUER & WAGNER LLP (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2018
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department S27; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Trial Date Set) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by HIGHTOWER ASSOCIATES LLC- AZ LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by SAUER & WAGNER LLP (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department S27; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • Answer; Filed by SAUER & WAGNER LLP (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by HIGHTOWER ASSOCIATES LLC- AZ LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by HIGHTOWER ASSOCIATES LLC- AZ LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less