This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/25/2020 at 08:01:52 (UTC).

HIDETOSHI SEIKE VS TAKASHI MURA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/14/2019 HIDETOSHI SEIKE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TAKASHI MURA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL S. MURPHY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5031

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL S. MURPHY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEIKE HIDETOSHI

Defendants

FUKUI EIKO

MURA TAKASHI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FEHMEL TERRY MICHAEL

Defendant Attorneys

COHEN ROBERT

SHOEMAKER LIZ

Other Attorneys

KERENDIAN RAMIN JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/6/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/7/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 09/16/2019

9/16/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 09/16/2019

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/16/2019

9/16/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/16/2019

Substitution of Attorney

8/16/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Related Case

8/9/2019: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS, INCLUDING DISMISSAL, FOR D...)

8/21/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS, INCLUDING DISMISSAL, FOR D...)

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND OSC RE: SANCTIONS

6/24/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND OSC RE: SANCTIONS

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARIKO TAENAKA RE OSC SANCTIONS

6/26/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARIKO TAENAKA RE OSC SANCTIONS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/20/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

6/13/2019: Case Management Statement

Answer

6/14/2019: Answer

Case Management Statement

6/14/2019: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/14/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

6/14/2019: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

5/10/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/10/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/11/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2020
  • Hearing02/28/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 09/16/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order) of 09/16/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Order to Show Cause Re: (Sanctions, including dismissal, for Defendant, Eiko Fukui, Failure to Appear at the CMC) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions, including dismissal, for D...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Takashi Mura (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Takashi Mura (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Hidetoshi Seike (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Hidetoshi Seike (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Hidetoshi Seike (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Hidetoshi Seike (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Hidetoshi Seike (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Hidetoshi Seike (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KERENDIAN RAMIN JOSEPH