This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/24/2020 at 07:49:41 (UTC).

HI POWER ENTERTAINMENT, INC. VS BIG ATOM GROUP, INC.

Case Summary

On 05/23/2018 HI POWER ENTERTAINMENT, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BIG ATOM GROUP, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9314

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HI POWER ENTERTAINMENT INC.

Defendants

BIG ATOM GROUP INC.

MORENO JAIME

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TRAUBEN MICHAEL A.

Defendant Attorneys

STEELE GEORGE L.

BERGLUND KEITH WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT/JUDGMENT)

8/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT/JUDGMENT)

Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

7/22/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/11/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

11/25/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ATTORNEY RUSSELL J. MILLER, THE BERGLUND GROUP'S MOTION TO BE...)

11/18/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ATTORNEY RUSSELL J. MILLER, THE BERGLUND GROUP'S MOTION TO BE...)

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

11/18/2019: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

11/8/2019: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

10/30/2019: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME ON NOTICE AND HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS C

10/30/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME ON NOTICE AND HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS C

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

6/25/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

3/22/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DEFENDANTS FAILURE TO APPEAR

3/18/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DEFENDANTS FAILURE TO APPEAR

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

11/21/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/23/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Proof-Service/Summons

6/6/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Proof-Service/Summons

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Proof-Service/Summons

6/6/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Proof-Service/Summons

Notice of Continuance - Notice of Continuance case management conference contd to 1-9-19 8:30 am dept P

11/26/2018: Notice of Continuance - Notice of Continuance case management conference contd to 1-9-19 8:30 am dept P

Answer - Contract

7/11/2018: Answer - Contract

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Status Conference (re entry of default/judgment) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference re: entry of default/judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketJudgment (- Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 08/10/2020 entered for Plaintiff HI POWER ENTERTAINMENT, INC. against Defendant MORENO, JAIME; Defendant BIG ATOM GROUP, INC., joint and several.); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketJudgment (Default Judgment); Filed by HI POWER ENTERTAINMENT, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (in support of Request for Default Judgment); Filed by HI POWER ENTERTAINMENT, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketStatement of the Case; Filed by HI POWER ENTERTAINMENT, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by HI POWER ENTERTAINMENT, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by HI POWER ENTERTAINMENT, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Status Conference (re entry of default/judgment) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketAnswer Contract

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by HI POWER ENTERTAINMENT, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by HI POWER ENTERTAINMENT, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by HI POWER ENTERTAINMENT, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: SC129314    Hearing Date: August 10, 2020    Dept: P

 

Tentative Ruling

Hi Power Entertainment, Inc. v. Big Atom Group, Inc. et al., Case No. SC129314

Hearing Date August 10, 2020

Request for Entry of Default Judgment

Analysis/Background

Plaintiff Hi Power Entertainment seeks entry of default judgment against defendants Big Atom Group, Inc. and Jaime Moreno. The court identifies the following issue:

Default is GRANTED as to defendant Big Atom but DENIED as to defendant Jaime Moreno. Plaintiff will submit further evidence as to alter ego liability.  

DUE TO THE ONGOING COVID-19 PANDEMIC, PARTIES AND COUNSEL ARE STRONGLY ENCOURAGED TO AVOID IN-PERSON APPEARANCES AND TO APPEAR REMOTELY. LA COURT CONNECT IS NOW AVAILABLE.