This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/24/2021 at 10:34:14 (UTC).

HEUNG-MING WONG, ET AL. VS GUILLERMO VAZQUEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/15/2021 HEUNG-MING WONG filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against GUILLERMO VAZQUEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1691

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WONG HEUNG-MING

YI LI-FANG

Defendants

VAZQUEZ GUILLERMO

BAY-VALLEY MORTGAGE GROUP A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA VALLEY VIEW HOME LOANS

CARMEN VAZQUEZ MARIA DEL

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT TITLE ESTATE LIEN OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFF'S TITLE OR ANY CLOUD UPON PLAINTIFF'S TITLE THERETO

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB DOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROUSSO MARY ANN

Defendant Attorney

KENT TERRY J.

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA - VERIFIED ANSWER

3/24/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA - VERIFIED ANSWER

Answer

3/24/2021: Answer

Notice of Lis Pendens

3/26/2021: Notice of Lis Pendens

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

3/30/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/11/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/11/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/11/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/1/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

1/26/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/26/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/15/2021: Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2021
  • Hearing05/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • Hearing05/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Heung-Ming Wong (Plaintiff); Li-Fang Yi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Heung-Ming Wong (Plaintiff); Li-Fang Yi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Errata - Verified Answer); Filed by Guillermo Vazquez (Defendant); Maria Del Carmen Vazquez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Guillermo Vazquez (Defendant); Maria Del Carmen Vazquez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Heung-Ming Wong (Plaintiff); Li-Fang Yi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Heung-Ming Wong (Plaintiff); Li-Fang Yi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Heung-Ming Wong (Plaintiff); Li-Fang Yi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Heung-Ming Wong (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Heung-Ming Wong (Plaintiff); Li-Fang Yi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Heung-Ming Wong (Plaintiff); Li-Fang Yi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Heung-Ming Wong (Plaintiff); Li-Fang Yi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAY VALLEY MORTGAGE GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROUSSO MARY A.