Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/10/2020 at 13:26:36 (UTC).

HESS, PATRICIA VS HESS, STEVE

Case Summary

On 06/05/2020 HESS, PATRICIA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against HESS, STEVE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4630

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HESS PATRICIA

Respondent

HESS STEVE

 

Court Documents

Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition

7/7/2020: Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition

Proof of Service of Summons

7/7/2020: Proof of Service of Summons

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

6/5/2020: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

6/5/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Summons

6/5/2020: Summons

Notice - Case Assignment

6/8/2020: Notice - Case Assignment

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

6/8/2020: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketNotice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less