Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/15/2021 at 02:50:41 (UTC).

HERRERA, ANA PATRICIA VS REYES, ABIGAIL

Case Summary

On 08/31/2020 HERRERA, ANA PATRICIA filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against REYES, ABIGAIL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Whittier Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SANTOS, M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1258

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Whittier Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SANTOS, M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HERRERA ANA PATRICIA

Respondent

REYES ABIGAIL

 

Court Documents

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

8/28/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/28/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition - Civil Harassment

8/28/2020: Petition - Civil Harassment

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

8/28/2020: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

8/28/2020: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

8/31/2020: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

9/22/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

9/22/2020: Minute Order

Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

9/22/2020: Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

9/22/2020: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

Proof of Service

10/6/2020: Proof of Service

Minute Order

10/13/2020: Minute Order

Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

10/13/2020: Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 123, Santos, M., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Denied - RO- After Evidence by both

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketStipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 123, Santos, M., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketStipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketRequest to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less