This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/08/2022 at 04:46:57 (UTC).

HERNANDEZ REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST (DECEDENT'S TRUST)

Case Summary

On 04/29/2022 HERNANDEZ REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST DECEDENT'S TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4308

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HERNANDEZ ROSALIE R.

Not Classified By Court

HERNANDEZ REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST DECEDENT'S TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BYRNE JOHN MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) - Petition for Approval of Trust Accounting

4/29/2022: Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) - Petition for Approval of Trust Accounting

Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

5/2/2022: Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

Notice - Hearing

5/4/2022: Notice - Hearing

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2022
  • Hearing07/08/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 67 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trust 17200 Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketPetition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) (Petition for Approval of Trust Accounting ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BYRNE JOHN MICHAEL