This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/03/2022 at 19:08:09 (UTC).

HERNANDEZ, MARIA VS CRUZ, URIEL HERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 09/03/2021 HERNANDEZ, MARIA filed a Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse lawsuit against CRUZ, URIEL HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARTELLA, TIMOTHY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0934

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARTELLA, TIMOTHY

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HERNANDEZ MARIA

Respondent

CRUZ URIEL HERNANDEZ

Other

HERNANDEZ EUNICE EILEEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

ROSENTHAL LISA FRANCINE

BURSK BONNIE MARIE

ROSENTHAL LISA F

Respondent Attorneys

LEVINE CHRISTIANA DANIELLE

LEVINE KENZIE

 

Court Documents

Petition - Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse

9/3/2021: Petition - Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

9/3/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

9/3/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

9/3/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Proof of Service

9/13/2021: Proof of Service

Substitution of Attorney

10/4/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order

9/27/2021: Minute Order

Substitution of Attorney

9/27/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order

10/8/2021: Minute Order

Substitution of Attorney - in, Kenzie Levine

10/8/2021: Substitution of Attorney - in, Kenzie Levine

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department S, Martella, Timothy, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney (in, Kenzie Levine ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Requestor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department S, Martella, Timothy, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Requestor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Requestor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Requestor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Requestor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketPetition - Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse; Filed by Requestor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Requestor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BURSK BONNIE MARIE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSENTHAL LISA F