Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/07/2021 at 09:11:40 (UTC).

HERNANDEZ, JOSE A. VS HERNANDEZ, CLAUDIA A.

Case Summary

On 01/29/2021 HERNANDEZ, JOSE A filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against HERNANDEZ, CLAUDIA A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0122

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HERNANDEZ JOSE A.

Respondent

HERNANDEZ CLAUDIA A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ABDOLHOSSEINI TINA H.

Respondent Attorney

ZUNIGA JESUS L

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney - OUT: PRO SE / IN: JESUS ZNIGA

4/2/2021: Substitution of Attorney - OUT: PRO SE / IN: JESUS ZNIGA

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC SERVICE

4/2/2021: Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Stipulation and Order - to Set Aside Default

4/5/2021: Stipulation and Order - to Set Aside Default

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

4/5/2021: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Request - Enter Default FL165

3/9/2021: Request - Enter Default FL165

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

2/9/2021: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Proof of Service of Summons - Served 02/02/21

2/9/2021: Proof of Service of Summons - Served 02/02/21

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

1/29/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

1/29/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Summons

1/29/2021: Summons

FL_General Family Law - FL - Notice - Case Assignment - Van Nuys

1/29/2021: FL_General Family Law - FL - Notice - Case Assignment - Van Nuys

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to Set Aside Default ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (ELECTRONIC SERVICE ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney (OUT: PRO SE / IN: JESUS ZNIGA ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketRequest - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (Served 02/02/21 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TINA ABDOLHOSSEINI H.