This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/18/2020 at 00:33:58 (UTC).

HERNANDEZ, EVA GARCIA VS CROOM, DARRELL E., JR

Case Summary

On 02/11/2020 HERNANDEZ, EVA GARCIA filed a Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse lawsuit against CROOM, DARRELL E , JR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DURON, ARMANDO and SAUCEDA, A. VERONICA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0239

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DURON, ARMANDO

SAUCEDA, A. VERONICA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HERNANDEZ EVA GARCIA

Respondent

CROOM DARRELL E. JR

 

Court Documents

Petition - Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse

2/11/2020: Petition - Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

2/11/2020: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

2/11/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

2/11/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

2/11/2020: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Minute Order

3/3/2020: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

3/3/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

3/3/2020: Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

Minute Order

3/25/2020: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department M, Sauceda, A. Veronica, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department M, Duron, Armando, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketStipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketPetition - Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.