This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/29/2019 at 01:21:15 (UTC).

HERNANDEZ, DOUGLAS OMAR BETANCOURT VS RUEDA, NURIA LOPEZ

Case Summary

On 01/29/2019 HERNANDEZ, DOUGLAS OMAR BETANCOURT filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against RUEDA, NURIA LOPEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LEWIS, THOMAS TRENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0001

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LEWIS, THOMAS TRENT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HERNANDEZ DOUGLAS OMAR BETANCOURT

Respondent

RUEDA NURIA LOPEZ

Not Classified By Court

LACEY JACKIE - District Attorney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

04/30/2019

Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 2, Lewis, Thomas Trent, Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Held - Order Made

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/30/2019

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2019

DocketProof of Service; Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/05/2019

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Lewis, Thomas Trent, Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Held - Continued

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/05/2019

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/19/2019

DocketProof of Service; Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/29/2019

DocketMiscellaneous (Memorandum of Law ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/29/2019

DocketMiscellaneous (Points and Authorities ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/29/2019

DocketNotice (of Application for the Return of the Minor ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/29/2019

DocketMiscellaneous (Writ of Habeas Corpus ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/29/2019

DocketApplication (for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Order ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/29/2019

DocketPetition - Habeas Corpus - Family Law; Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less