This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/11/2022 at 19:36:06 (UTC).

HERNANDEZ, DANIEL V - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 HERNANDEZ, DANIEL filed a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit against - DECEDENT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAY, GUS T.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0543

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAY, GUS T.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HERNANDEZ PATRICK

Decedent

HERNANDEZ DANIEL V

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BROUSARD JILL ANNETTE

 

Court Documents

Petition - Probate of Lost Will (Initial)

1/19/2022: Petition - Probate of Lost Will (Initial)

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

1/26/2022: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

1/25/2022: Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

Minute Order

2/17/2022: Minute Order

Proof of Publication

2/4/2022: Proof of Publication

Notice - Notice of Continuance

2/24/2022: Notice - Notice of Continuance

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2022
  • Hearing03/16/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 2D at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Continuance ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 2D, May, Gus T., Presiding; Court Order Hearing - Not Held - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketProof of Publication; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketPetition - Probate of Lost Will (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROUSARD JILL ANNETTE