This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/04/2022 at 11:08:18 (UTC).

HERNANDEZ CRUZ, MARIA VS HERNANDEZ, EUNICE ERLEEN

Case Summary

On 09/10/2021 HERNANDEZ CRUZ, MARIA filed a Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse lawsuit against HERNANDEZ, EUNICE ERLEEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARTELLA, TIMOTHY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0961

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARTELLA, TIMOTHY

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HERNANDEZ CRUZ MARIA

Respondent

HERNANDEZ EUNICE ERLEEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Respondent Attorneys

ROSENTHAL LISA FRANCINE

ROSENTHAL LISA F

BURSK BONNIE MARIE

LEVINE CHRISTIANA DANIELLE

LEVINE KENZIE

 

Court Documents

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

9/10/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

9/10/2021: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Petition - Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse

9/10/2021: Petition - Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - DENIED

9/10/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - DENIED

Minute Order

10/8/2021: Minute Order

Substitution of Attorney

10/4/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Proof of Service - EA200: of EA109, EA100...

9/27/2021: Proof of Service - EA200: of EA109, EA100...

Minute Order

9/27/2021: Minute Order

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

9/27/2021: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

9/27/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department S, Martella, Timothy, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department S, Martella, Timothy, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketRequest to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (EA200: of EA109, EA100... ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketPetition - Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109) (DENIED ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVINE KENZIE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVINE CHRISTIANA DANIELLE MACKENZIE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSENTHAL LISA F