This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2022 at 21:02:50 (UTC).

HERNANDEZ, CARLOS ABRAHAM - MINOR'S COMPROMISE

Case Summary

On 05/03/2022 HERNANDEZ, CARLOS ABRAHAM - MINOR'S COMPROMISE was filed as a Probate - Minor Compromise Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BOGDANOFF, LEE R.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4405

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Minor Compromise Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BOGDANOFF, LEE R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HERNANDEZ CARLOS ALBERTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ORAN MICHAEL LAWRENCE

 

Court Documents

Petition - Approve Minor's Compromise

5/3/2022: Petition - Approve Minor's Compromise

Proposed Order - Approving Compromise of Claim - Proposed Order - Approving Compromise of Claim

5/5/2022: Proposed Order - Approving Compromise of Claim - Proposed Order - Approving Compromise of Claim

PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

5/9/2022: PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

Proposed Order - Approving Compromise of Claim

6/2/2022: Proposed Order - Approving Compromise of Claim

Minute Order

6/2/2022: Minute Order

Order - Approving Compromise of Claim

6/23/2022: Order - Approving Compromise of Claim

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2022
  • Hearing10/25/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 29 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketOrder - Approving Compromise of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 29, Bogdanoff, Lee R., Presiding; Minor's Compromise Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketPetition Granted (Petition - Approve Minor's Compromise filed on May 3, 2022. )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketProposed Order - Approving Compromise of Claim; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketRejected Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketProposed Order - Approving Compromise of Claim (Proposed Order - Approving Compromise of Claim ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketPetition - Approve Minor's Compromise; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ORAN MICHAEL LAWRENCE