This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/09/2023 at 07:31:01 (UTC).

HERNANDEZ, ARACELY VS CAMPOS, SARAH

Case Summary

On 04/14/2022 HERNANDEZ, ARACELY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CAMPOS, SARAH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DURON, ARMANDO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4110

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DURON, ARMANDO

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HERNANDEZ ARACELY

Respondent

CAMPOS SARAH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ELKADDOUM ROCKY

 

Court Documents

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 - Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

4/14/2022: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 - Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child - Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

4/14/2022: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child - Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

Summons - Summons

4/14/2022: Summons - Summons

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

4/14/2022: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Proof of Service of Summons

4/26/2022: Proof of Service of Summons

Notice - Notice of Case Review Status Conference

11/29/2022: Notice - Notice of Case Review Status Conference

Minute Order

12/2/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/24/2023: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2023
  • Hearing06/09/2023 at 8:30 AM in Department 87 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 87, Duron, Armando, Presiding; Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 87, Duron, Armando, Presiding; Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Case Review Status Conference ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketNotice - Status Conference Review: Proof of Service (Noticed by LASC )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 (Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child (Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketSummons (Summons ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less