This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/15/2022 at 23:14:41 (UTC).

HERNAN ORELLANA VS S.C. ELLIOT CORP.

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 HERNAN ORELLANA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against S C ELLIOT CORP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2018

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ORELLANA HERNAN

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

S.C. ELLIOT CORP. DBA WOK EXPRESS

Cross Defendants

ROES 1 THROUGH 25

ROES 1 THROUGH 25 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AZIZI DAVID

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

KENNEDY KEVIN P.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/18/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

1/18/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

1/18/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

1/18/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/18/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/18/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

1/18/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/18/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/18/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

1/18/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Answer

4/25/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/25/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/25/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

4/25/2022: Cross-Complaint

Demand for Jury Trial

4/25/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Objection - OBJECTION DEFENDANT S.C. ELLIOTT CORP. DBA WOK EXPRESS JELD WEN, INC. V. SUPERIOR COURT OBJECTION

4/25/2022: Objection - OBJECTION DEFENDANT S.C. ELLIOTT CORP. DBA WOK EXPRESS JELD WEN, INC. V. SUPERIOR COURT OBJECTION

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2025
  • Hearing01/14/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2023
  • Hearing07/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • Hearing07/05/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Kevin P. Kennedy (Attorney): Organization Name changed from KENNEDY & SOUZA, APC to KENNEDY & SOUZA, AP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: S.C. ELLIOT CORP. (Defendant); As to: ROES 1 through 25 (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: S.C. ELLIOT CORP. (Defendant); As to: HERNAN ORELLANA (Plaintiff); ROES 1 through 25, inclusive (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: S.C. ELLIOT CORP. (Defendant); As to: HERNAN ORELLANA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketObjection DEFENDANT S.C. ELLIOTT CORP. dba WOK EXPRESS JELD WEN, INC. V. SUPERIOR COURT OBJECTION; Filed by: S.C. ELLIOT CORP. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: S.C. ELLIOT CORP. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: S.C. ELLIOT CORP. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: HERNAN ORELLANA (Plaintiff); As to: S.C. ELLIOT CORP. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: HERNAN ORELLANA (Plaintiff); As to: S.C. ELLIOT CORP. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: HERNAN ORELLANA (Plaintiff); As to: S.C. ELLIOT CORP. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KENNEDY KEVIN P.