Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/08/2021 at 22:18:43 (UTC).

HERMINIA PALACIOS VS LA AMAPOLA, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/23/2020 HERMINIA PALACIOS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LA AMAPOLA, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4990

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PALACIOS HERMINIA

Defendant

LA AMAPOLA INC. DBA AMAPOLA MARKET

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PENNELL JONATHAN MAYNARD

Defendant Attorney

HONEY ANNE M

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/21/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

4/21/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

4/6/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

1/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

1/4/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/23/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/23/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/23/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/23/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2023
  • Hearing11/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • Hearing05/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • Hearing05/09/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by La Amapola, Inc. dba Amapola Mexican Deli Erroneously Sued As La Amapola, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by La Amapola, Inc. dba Amapola Mexican Deli Erroneously Sued As La Amapola, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Herminia Palacios (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Herminia Palacios (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Herminia Palacios (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Herminia Palacios (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LA AMAPOLA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HONEY ANNE M