This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/29/2021 at 19:07:34 (UTC).

HERMAN, SUSAN VS BATISTE, ERICKA

Case Summary

On 04/28/2020 HERMAN, SUSAN filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against BATISTE, ERICKA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BOSLEY, GIA G. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0284

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BOSLEY, GIA G

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HERMAN SUSAN

Respondent

BATISTE ERICKA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BRILLAULT ASHLIE N.

Respondent Attorney

BENAVIDES JOEL LUNA

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

12/14/2020: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) - Hrg 12/14/20 Dept 11 8:30am

11/23/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) - Hrg 12/14/20 Dept 11 8:30am

Minute Order

11/23/2020: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) - Hrg 11/23/20 Dept 11 8:30am

10/21/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) - Hrg 11/23/20 Dept 11 8:30am

Minute Order

10/21/2020: Minute Order

Response - Domestic Violence

9/11/2020: Response - Domestic Violence

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) - Hrg 10/21/20 Dept 11 8:30am

9/14/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) - Hrg 10/21/20 Dept 11 8:30am

Minute Order

9/14/2020: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/21/2020: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) - Hrg 09/14/2020 Dept H 8:30 am

7/21/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) - Hrg 09/14/2020 Dept H 8:30 am

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/28/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

4/28/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Petition - Civil Harassment

4/28/2020: Petition - Civil Harassment

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - - Granted

4/28/2020: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - - Granted

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

4/28/2020: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Proof of Service

5/4/2020: Proof of Service

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 11, Bosley, Gia G, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 11, Bosley, Gia G, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) (Hrg 12/14/20 Dept 11 8:30am ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 11, Bosley, Gia G, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) (Hrg 11/23/20 Dept 11 8:30am ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2020
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid A; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2020
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid A; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department H, Bosley, Gia G, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) (Hrg 09/14/2020 Dept H 8:30 am ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (- Granted ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRILLAULT ASHLIE N.