This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/10/2023 at 07:32:27 (UTC).

HERLINDA GONZALEZ VS EMINENT, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/29/2022 HERLINDA GONZALEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against EMINENT, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER and YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1958

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GONZALEZ HERLINDA

Defendants

MENTE MICHAEL

EMINENT INC DBA "REVOLVE"

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GILL JASMIN KAUR

Defendant Attorney

ESTRADA DIANA M.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 01/31/2023

1/31/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 01/31/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 01/31/2023

1/31/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 01/31/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

1/13/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

1/13/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

Initial Status Conference Order

11/29/2022: Initial Status Conference Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;)

11/29/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;)

Response - RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

11/22/2022: Response - RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

Notice of Related Case

11/17/2022: Notice of Related Case

Answer

11/17/2022: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/20/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/20/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/20/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

10/5/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/5/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint

9/29/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/29/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/29/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/29/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re Notice of Related Case) of 01/31/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Notice of Related Case) of 01/31/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Not Related

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Initial Status Conference;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Consolidation Required

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Initial Status Conference;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketInitial Status Conference scheduled for 01/13/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 9 updated: Result Date to 01/13/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCase numbers 22STCV31998, and 22STCV31958 consolidated; case number 22STCV31998 is the lead case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Judicial Bulletin Board

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Related Case: Filed By: EMINENT, INC (Defendant),MICHAEL MENTE (Defendant); Result: Reviewed ; Result Date: 11/29/2022 ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- EMINENT, INC (Defendant): Organization Name changed from EMINENT, INC., a Delaware corporation to EMINENT, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 58

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Bruce G. Iwasaki in Department 58 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: HERLINDA GONZALEZ (Plaintiff); As to: EMINENT, INC., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); MICHAEL MENTE (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: HERLINDA GONZALEZ (Plaintiff); As to: EMINENT, INC., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); MICHAEL MENTE (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: HERLINDA GONZALEZ (Plaintiff); As to: EMINENT, INC., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); MICHAEL MENTE (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less