This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2019 at 11:14:55 (UTC).

HERBERT BARBER VS MATEO BEGUE, ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/17/2017 HERBERT BARBER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MATEO BEGUE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRIAN C. YEP. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7316

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BRIAN C. YEP

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARBER HERBERT

Defendants

ESTATE OF ALEJANDRO M

BEGUE MATEO

BEGUE NANCY

BEQUE MATEO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LEPORE ROBERT T. ESQ.

LEPORE ROBERT THEODORE ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

FITZ-SIMMONS DOUGLAS

ANDRADE ALVIN DOUGLAS

 

Court Documents

Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits

5/24/2019: Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits

Legacy Document

9/5/2017: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

9/7/2018: Legacy Document

Certificate of Mailing for

2/5/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Notice of Ruling

2/8/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order

5/6/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/10/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/20/2019: Minute Order

Order - Dismissal

5/21/2019: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order

5/21/2019: Minute Order

Other -

5/22/2019: Other -

Minute Order

5/23/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/24/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Change of Address

11/20/2017: Notice of Change of Address

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/19/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET AND ADDENDUM

8/17/2017: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET AND ADDENDUM

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

8/17/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

SUMMONS

8/17/2017: SUMMONS

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2019
  • Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial; Filed by Herbert Barber (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Memorandum of Costs (Summary) ((Amended)); Filed by Estate of Alejandro M (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Memorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by Estate of Alejandro M (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Judgment Following General Verdict; Filed by Mateo Beque (Defendant); Estate of Alejandro M (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • at 09:45 AM in Department A14, Brian C. Yep, Presiding; Jury Trial - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Notice (of civil deposit of daily jury fees); Filed by Estate of Alejandro M (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Special Verdict; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Jury Instructions; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Amendment to Complaint; Filed by Herbert Barber (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET AND ADDENDUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • 2ND AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE:PI

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.