Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2021 at 14:55:53 (UTC).

HERAEUS MEDICAL LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS ARBITRIO INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 HERAEUS MEDICAL LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ARBITRIO INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0349

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERAEUS MEDICAL LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant

ARBITRIO INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA ARBITRIO HEALTH SYSTEM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JEN JERRY J

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/16/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/15/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2021
  • Hearing07/22/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department U at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by HERAEUS MEDICAL LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by HERAEUS MEDICAL LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by HERAEUS MEDICAL LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JEN JERRY J.