This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/18/2019 at 02:10:25 (UTC).

HER MAJESTY THE QUEEN IN RIGHT OF CANADA VS PATRICK PELLAND

Case Summary

On 06/05/2018 HER MAJESTY THE QUEEN IN RIGHT OF CANADA filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against PATRICK PELLAND. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8875

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HER MAJESTY THE QUEEN IN RIGHT OF CANADA

Defendant

PELLAND PATRICK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MALEK JEFFREY L. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR: ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO THE UNIFORM FOREIGN- COUNTRY MONEY JUDGMENTS RECOGNITION ACT (C.C.P. 1713 ET SEQ.)

6/5/2018: COMPLAINT FOR: ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO THE UNIFORM FOREIGN- COUNTRY MONEY JUDGMENTS RECOGNITION ACT (C.C.P. 1713 ET SEQ.)

SUMMONS

6/5/2018: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/8/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/3/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

9/12/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

9/12/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

9/5/2018: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17; (Order to Show Cause; Vacated) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Her Majesty The Queen in Right of Canada, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Her Majesty The Queen in Right of Canada, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Her Majesty The Queen in Right of Canada, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO THE UNIFORM FOREIGN- COUNTRY MONEY JUDGMENTS RECOGNITION ACT (C.C.P. 1713 ET SEQ.)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

Jeffrey L. Malek (State Bar No. 94080) FILED

Laura L. Lewis (State Bar No. 134737) > County of Lo el

MALEK & MALEK &

3625 Del Amo Boulevard, Suite 350 JUN 05 2018 Torrance, California 90503 Sherri R. Cagter, Execyfj Telephone: 310-540-5100 By Mfic;flflerk Facsimile: 310-371-7242 Moses Sot ' Pu¥

Attorneys for Plaintiff, HER MAJESTY THE QUEEN IN RIGHT OF CANADA AS

REPRESENTED BY THE MINISTER OF NATIONAL REVENUE SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

COUNTY OF LOSANGELES, TORRANCE Her Majesty the Queen in Right of Canada as CASE NO. BC 70887 Represented by The Minister of National | o Revenue, a Governmental agency, - COMPLAINT FOR:

ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO THE UNIFORM FOREIGN- COUNTRY MONEY JUDGMENTS RECOGNITION ACT

(C.C.P. §1713 et seq.)

Plaintiff, V.

Patrick Pelland, an individual; and DOES 1 to

10, Inclusive, ‘

UNLIMITED CIVIL

Defendants.

N N’N’

Plaintiff, HER MAJESTY THE QUEEN IN RIGHT OF CANADA AS REPRESENTED BY THE MINISTER OF NATIONAL REVENUE (“Plaintift”) complains and alleges on information and belief the following against Patrick Pelland, 'individually; and Does 1 to 10, Inclusive (collectively “Defendants”) as follows:

| THE PARTIES

1. Plaintiff is, and at all times relevant was, é governmental agency of Canada.v

2. Defendant, Patrick Pelland (“Defendant™) is an individual who resided in

Canada, and is presently a resident of Torrance, California, USA.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HER MAJESTY THE QUEEN IN RIGHT OF CANADA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MALEK JEFFREY LELAND