This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/25/2021 at 06:34:36 (UTC).

HENRY POLANCO VS MONTEBELLO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 08/28/2020 HENRY POLANCO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against MONTEBELLO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MEL RED RECANA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3090

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MEL RED RECANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

POLANCO HENRY

Defendant

MONTEBELLO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZAMBRANO RONALD LEONARDO

Defendant Attorney

MADRUGA THOMAS MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 03/04/2021

3/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 03/04/2021

Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

2/16/2021: Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/16/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

2/16/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/23/2021: Case Management Statement

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

11/20/2020: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

12/21/2020: Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/21/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/5/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/4/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/28/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/28/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/28/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/28/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/2/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2022
  • Hearing08/15/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • Hearing08/02/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • Hearing08/02/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 03/04/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Montebello Unified School District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by Henry Polanco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Henry Polanco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Henry Polanco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Montebello Unified School District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketAnswer (TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT); Filed by Montebello Unified School District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Henry Polanco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Henry Polanco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Henry Polanco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Henry Polanco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Henry Polanco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Henry Polanco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MONTEBELLO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZAMBRANO RONALD LEONARDO